Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 220 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7227 Week
» 13361 Month
» 241245 Year
» 1462810 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1344   03/1897
LMS (1923) 10777   by 1925
BR 50777   05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 30
Works Number 504
To Service During 03/1897
Withdrawal Fri 03/10/1958
Service Life 61 yrs, 7 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1897
27C Southport 8w/e 14/06/1952
24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 24/04/1954
25E Sowerby Bridge 8w/e 19/06/1954
   Withdrawn 03/10/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1897 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1344
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 504
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10777    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 50777    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
03/10/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 50777    

prev prev