Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3309 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33959 Week
» 132604 Month
» 335268 Year
» 3362121 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1332 |
|
01/1897 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10765 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50765 |
|
12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
30 |
Works Number |
492 |
To Service |
During 01/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/06/1954 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1332 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 492 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10765 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (23C) |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
15/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
06/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50765 |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
02/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
12/06/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50765 |
|
|