Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1443 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15486 Week
» 80440 Month
» 283104 Year
» 3309957 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1331 |
|
01/1897 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10764 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50764 |
|
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
30 |
Works Number |
491 |
To Service |
During 01/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/07/1956 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1331 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 491 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10764 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50764 |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
17/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
07/07/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50764 |
|
|