Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4252 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17658 Week
» 70674 Month
» 190201 Year
» 3217054 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
156 |
|
04/1896 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10736 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50736 |
|
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
27 |
Works Number |
443 |
To Service |
During 04/1896 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1951 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 156 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 443 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10736 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 50736 but not taken up |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
28/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
17/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
12/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 10736 |
|
|