Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 66 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17869 Week
» 70885 Month
» 190412 Year
» 3217265 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1212 |
|
11/1893 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10697 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50697 |
|
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
16 |
Works Number |
263 |
To Service |
During 11/1893 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/05/1952 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1893 |
26C |
|
Bolton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
8B |
|
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
17/05/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1948 |
Manchester (London Road)-Lymm-Warrington |
The last of the Webb 'Cauliflower' tanks have now disappeared and their duties taken over by three 2-4-2 ex L. & Y. tanks, Nos. 10697, 10703 an 10705. |
SLS/194808 |
31/08/1948 |
Broadheath-Lymm-Warrington Section |
The local passenger service to and from Manchester (London Road) continues to be worked mainly by Fowler and Stanier 2-6-2T's, Stanier 2-6-4T's, ex L. & Y. 2-4-2T's and Class '2' 4-4-0 No. 674. The latter makes one 'afternoon trip from Warrington to London Road and back. Morning turns are usually handled by 2-6-2T's Nos. 2, 6 o 7 and one of the three ex-L. & Y. 2-4-2T's (Nos. 10697, 10703 or 10705). No. 71 (9A) is the most regular Stanier 2-6-2T, and 2606 (BA) the most usual 2-6-4T on duty. A couple of trips from Warrington to Broadheath and back are usually sandwiched in between its other duties by the Hartford motor train which is pushed or pulled by Webb 2-4-2T No. 6603 o 6668. The fairly heavy freight traffic is shared fairly equally between ex L.N.W. 0-8-0's and Class '8F' 2-8-0's, while the working of the Arpley-Broadheath tranships train is invariably entrusted to one of the several ex Midland Class '3' 0-6-0's shedded at Warrington |
SLS/194810 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1212 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 263 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10697 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bolton (26C) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50697 |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50697 |
|
|