Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2088 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19891 Week
» 72907 Month
» 192434 Year
» 3219287 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1211 |
|
11/1893 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10696 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50696 |
|
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
16 |
Works Number |
262 |
To Service |
During 11/1893 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1949 |
Service Life |
55 yrs , 3 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1893 |
23C |
|
Southport |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
8A |
|
Edge Hill |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
7D |
|
Rhyl |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
02/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
LOAN |
7D |
Rhyl |
w/e |
21/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
LOAN |
7D |
Rhyl |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
7D |
Rhyl |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1211 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 262 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10696 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 50696 but not taken up |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
27/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 10696 |
|
|