Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1418 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32068 Week
» 130713 Month
» 333377 Year
» 3360230 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
46 |
|
09/1893 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10687 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50687 |
|
07/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
16 |
Works Number |
252 |
To Service |
During 09/1893 |
Withdrawal |
During 05/1953 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 46 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 252 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10687 |
|
|
22/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50687 |
|
|
03/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
11/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
05/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50687 |
|
|