Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 4713 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18756 Week
» 83710 Month
» 286374 Year
» 3313227 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1177 |
|
09/1892 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10675 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50675 |
|
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
12 |
Works Number |
178 |
To Service |
During 09/1892 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 31/12/1949 |
Service Life |
57 yrs , 4 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1892 |
24D |
|
Lower Darwen |
4w/e |
22/06/1946 |
24F |
|
Fleetwood |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
7D |
|
Rhyl |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
24F |
Fleetwood |
w/e |
11/10/1947 |
LOAN |
7D |
Rhyl |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
7D |
Rhyl |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1177 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 178 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10675 |
|
|
22/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50675 |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50675 |
|
|