Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1333 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19136 Week
» 72152 Month
» 191679 Year
» 3218532 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1160 |
|
05/1892 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10651 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50651 |
|
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
11 |
Works Number |
154 |
To Service |
During 05/1892 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/12/1955 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
26D |
Bury |
w/e |
24/03/1951 |
LOAN |
27B |
Aintree |
w/e |
16/06/1951 |
ALLOC |
26D |
Bury |
w/e |
11/08/1951 |
ALLOC |
24B |
Rose Grove |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/12/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1160 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 154 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10651 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bacup (26E) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50651 |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50651 |
|
|