Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1520 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19323 Week
» 72339 Month
» 191866 Year
» 3218719 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1008 |
|
02/1889 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10621 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50621 |
|
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
1 |
Works Number |
1 |
To Service |
During 02/1889 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 18/09/1954 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 7 mths , 18 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1889 |
20D |
|
Normanton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
20E |
|
Manningham |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
18/09/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20E |
Manningham |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/09/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
Status Date |
17/09/2018 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/08/1947 |
Normanton MPD |
On 24/8 Class 5 4-6-0 No. 4986 with self-weighing tender was on the shed here and in contrast to this was No. 10621 the original L. & Y. 2-4-2T. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1889 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1008 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 1 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10621 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Normanton (20D) |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (20E) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50621 |
|
|
18/09/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50621 |
|
|