Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2051 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19854 Week
» 72870 Month
» 192397 Year
» 3219250 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
202 |
m/e |
02/1894 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6669 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
46669 |
y/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
1P |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3423 |
To Service |
During 02/1894 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1949 |
Service Life |
55 yrs , 7 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1894 |
2E |
|
Warwick |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
8B |
|
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
09/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2E |
Warwick |
w/e |
24/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1894 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 202 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3423 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6669 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Warwick (2E) |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 46669 but not taken up |
|
|
1949 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6669 |
|
|