|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/09/1947 | St Rollox Works | Ex. Highland 4-6-0 No. 103 was taken into the Erecting Shop on 2/9 presumably for reconditioning; the coupling and connecting rods, boiler mountings, etc., have been in the works for some considerable time but this was the first movement of the actual loco. No. 6656 (27C) arrived on 20/8. This is the first L. & N.W. loco. to be repaired here. | SLS/194710 |
31/12/1948 | Crewe Works | New Work December: 'IVĀ° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with. Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque. |
SLS/194902 |
20/08/1951 | Beattock | Two standard Class 4F 0-6-0 are on loan from 68A for banking duties, one of which (No. 44008) hae a tender cab. The Moffat branch is worked by Webb 2-4-2T 46656 (L.N.W. 2132, 6/93). | SLS/195111 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1893 | To Service | To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2132 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3402 |
||
03/1927 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 6656 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Hamilton (West) (27C) | ||
31/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (27A) | ||
27/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dumfries (12G) | ||
11/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dumfries (12G) | ||
01/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 46656 | ||
09/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Beattock (68D) | ||
16/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Beattock (68D) | ||
02/1952 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 46656 | ||
04/1952 | Scrapped | Scrapped |