Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 4296 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17702 Week
» 70718 Month
» 190245 Year
» 3217098 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
465 |
m/e |
01/1891 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6604 |
m/e |
01/1927 |
British Railways |
46604 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
1P |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3155 |
To Service |
During 01/1891 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 20/08/1955 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 7 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/08/1952 |
Bangor MPD |
Among the 32 locomotives shedded at 6H, are Webb 2-4-2T 46604 an 46701: 'Coal tank' 58903 and 'Cauliflower' 58375. The balance is divided between light 2-6-2Ts, three 'class 5' 4-6-0's, one Stanier 2-6-2T (40132): 2-6-4Ts, three ex-L47 0-6-0's and two '4F' 0-6-0's (44445 and 44305). The last two engines have been on Bangor Shed strength for seven years. |
SLS/195211 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1891 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 465 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3155 |
|
|
01/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6604 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (7B) |
|
|
23/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46604 |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
02/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
11/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warwick (2C) |
|
|
1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
20/08/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46604 |
|
|