Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2062 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15468 Week
» 68484 Month
» 188011 Year
» 3214864 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4202 |
m/e |
02/1912 |
Great Western Railway (Rblds) |
7242 |
on |
28/09/1937 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
187 |
Works Number |
2446 |
To Service |
During 02/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 08/06/1964 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 4 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
27/07/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/06/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4202 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2446 |
|
|
28/09/1937 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7242 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aberdare (ABDR) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
08/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7242 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|