Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3457 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16863 Week
» 69879 Month
» 189406 Year
» 3216259 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
69 |
m/e |
08/1907 |
Great Western Railway (1922) |
420 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
Great Western Railway (1946) |
220 |
on |
12/11/1948 (At Caerphilly Factory) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Hurry Riches |
Class |
O4 |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Manning, Wardle & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1703 |
To Service |
During 08/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 08/04/1951 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 8 mths , 8 dys |
Total Mileage |
406,830 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1907 |
CDF |
|
Cardiff Canton |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/04/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/04/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 69 Built at Manning, Wardle & Co., Works Number 1703 |
|
|
10/1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 420 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Canton (CDF) |
|
|
12/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 220 |
|
|
08/04/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 220 |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|