Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3642 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17048 Week
» 70064 Month
» 189591 Year
» 3216444 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4182 |
27/09/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08952 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1970 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/10/1970 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
11/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/09/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
09/1970 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
10/10/1970 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
11/1975 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/09/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4182 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
09/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08952 |
|
|
17/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
21/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
29/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
07/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|
14/07/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08952 |
|
|