Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2719 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16125 Week
» 69141 Month
» 188668 Year
» 3215521 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4179 |
05/09/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08949 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
30/05/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/09/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
05/1970 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
30/05/1970 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/09/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4179 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
29/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
30/05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08949 |
|
|
08/12/1980 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
17/05/1993 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|
03/09/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|