Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 109 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17912 Week
» 70928 Month
» 190455 Year
» 3217308 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4174 |
on |
02/11/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/11/1949 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4174 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Cheltenham Malvern Road (CHEL) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
14/07/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exeter (83C) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
26/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (82D) |
|
|
04/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
15/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4174 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|