Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1458 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7242 Week
» 28631 Month
» 148158 Year
» 3175011 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4167 |
24/05/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08937 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
24/05/1962 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
23/12/1993 off Laira (LA) |
Time in Service |
31 yrs, 6 mths , 29 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/05/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
02/1975 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4167 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08937 |
|
|
02/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
22/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
23/12/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08937 from Laira (LA) |
|
|