Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1211 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19014 Week
» 72030 Month
» 191557 Year
» 3218410 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4160 |
24/04/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08930 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
19/06/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/04/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
19/06/1975 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/04/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4160 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
03/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08930 |
|
|
05/04/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
05/04/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (WH) |
|
|
19/06/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
21/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
19/02/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08930 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
28/06/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|