30/09/1947 |
General |
The latest batch of 41XX 2-6-2T have been noted in many places. No. 4148 was seen working local trains between Newport and Cardiff and on station pilot duties at Newport. No. 4157 passed through Cheltenham en route to Tyseley and has since worked stopping trains to Leamington. No. 4159 , also allocated to the Wolverhampton Division (CHR) went via Oxford and was noted there on 12/9. Nos. 4156/8 have joined the 2-6-2T allocated to Severn Tunnel Junction for assisting trains through the tunnel. Recent observations in West Wales found Nos. 3654 an 4654 at Milford Haven, the former on the passenger turn to Johnstone. Nos. 7816, 3447 an 4358, were impressively clean at Neyland. Carmarthen produced a number of the smaller types of loco. Nos. 7407 an 2236 on local goods, 2223 on the 6.15 p.m. departure for Aberystwyth and L.M.S. Nos. 6620 an 6740 on the branch trains to Llandovery. No. 5819, once a regular at Newcastle Emlyn was awaiting repair outside the factory. |
SLS/194710 |
30/12/1962 |
Western Regionboundary changes |
The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. |
SLS/196303 |
24/03/1963 |
Wolverhampton Works (Works) |
Works: 1020 (82B), 1024 (82A), 2879 (82C), 4130/7, 4158 (84E), 4278, 4671, 5070 (81A), 5215, 5606, 6114 (86E), 6134, 6347 (87F), 6424, 6667, 6833/71, 6911, 7000 (85B), 8446 (88C), 9619, 9782. Yard: 1424 (85B), 6900 (82C), 6910. |
SLS/196304 |
15/05/1963 |
Derby Works (Works) |
Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 41535, 42098 cut up, 44466, 44521, 47003, 73021/86, 75064, D102, D2236, D2396, D2509, D2911, D3023, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D63, D88, D110, D5019, D5074; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5198, D5210-23new. Diesel Erecting Shop: D43, D85, D89, D95, D103/9/26/8, D140/9, D152/4, D5091. Test House: D71, D83, D124, D5002/86, D5145, D5205/6/7. Finishing Shop: D94, D119, D5208/9. Paint Shop: D5203/4. Yard (by Paint Shop): 42117 cut up, D4, D6, D7, D77, D127, D5010/93, D5200. Foundry Siding: 42100, 42429/72, 42500, 43599, 73001/67, 75012. Stone Pit: 42333, 42636 (badly damaged after falling into t.t. pit at Derby, 24th April), 44252, 47460. Stored Outside Offices: 10000/201/2/3. Waiting Works: 73032. |
SLS/196304 |