Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 1488 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7272 Week
» 28661 Month
» 148188 Year
» 3175041 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4145 |
11/09/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08915 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
11/09/1962 to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
Withdrawn |
01/02/2004 |
Time in Service |
41 yrs, 4 mths , 21 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/09/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/09/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4145 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
17/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08915 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
31/10/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
01/02/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08915 |
|
|