Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 559 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6343 Week
» 27732 Month
» 147259 Year
» 3174112 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4141 |
08/08/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08911 |
06/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
08/08/1962 to Carnforth (24L) |
Withdrawn |
01/05/2004 |
Time in Service |
41 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
LMR Blue - a lighter shade of blue than standard BR Blue |
by 12/1975 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/08/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/08/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
12/08/1971 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/08/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4141 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
10/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
03/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
12/08/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08911 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to LMR Blue - a lighter shade of blue than standard BR Blue |
|
|
24/07/1988 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
01/05/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08911 |
|
|