Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1616 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15022 Week
» 68038 Month
» 187565 Year
» 3214418 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4123 |
20/03/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08893 |
09/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1976 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/03/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
01/1976 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/03/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4123 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
24/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08893 |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (SY) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
26/06/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08893 |
|
|
08/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|