Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 803 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31453 Week
» 130098 Month
» 332762 Year
» 3359615 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4122 |
16/03/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08892 |
12/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
16/03/1962 to Swindon (82C) |
Status |
In Service |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/03/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
05/1973 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/03/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4122 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
28/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
24/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
30/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F) |
|
|
05/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08892 |
|
|
07/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|