Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 604 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6388 Week
» 27777 Month
» 147304 Year
» 3174157 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4114 |
21/01/1962 |
|
TOPS (09/0) |
09026 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
09 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
21/01/1962 to Lostock Hall (24C) |
Withdrawn |
01/10/2005 |
Time in Service |
43 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 01/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/01/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4114 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
14/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
29/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
04/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selhurst (75C) |
|
|
12/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 09026 |
|
|
31/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
01/10/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 09026 |
|
|