Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 310 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18113 Week
» 71129 Month
» 190656 Year
» 3217509 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4098 |
11/09/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08884 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/09/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/09/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
05/09/1973 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/09/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4098 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fort William (63B) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fort William (63B) |
|
|
01/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
01/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
01/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
05/09/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
15/09/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08884 |
|
|