Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4194 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17600 Week
» 70616 Month
» 190143 Year
» 3216996 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4097 |
08/09/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08883 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/09/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/09/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4097 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
18/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fort William (63B) |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
27/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08883 |
|
|
31/10/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (ML) |
|
|
28/02/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08883 |
|
|
12/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|