Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1147 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6931 Week
» 28320 Month
» 147847 Year
» 3174700 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4095 |
23/08/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08881 |
09/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
23/08/1961 to Fort William (63B) |
Withdrawn |
01/02/2004 |
Time in Service |
42 yrs, 5 mths , 9 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1981 |
|
Buckeye couplings fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/08/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/08/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4095 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Fort William (63B) |
|
|
18/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
01/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
21/04/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08881 |
|
|
04/09/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Buckeye couplings fitted |
|
|
01/02/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08881 |
|
|