Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1225 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7009 Week
» 28398 Month
» 147925 Year
» 3174778 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4092 |
02/05/1962 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/05/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4092 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
01/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
01/09/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4092 |
|
|