Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3604 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17010 Week
» 70026 Month
» 189553 Year
» 3216406 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9668 |
on |
06/06/1932 |
British Railways |
49668 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 06/06/1932 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 11/11/1961 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
06/06/1932 |
26F |
|
Lees (Oldham) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
27B |
|
Aintree |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
26B |
|
Agecroft |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
11/11/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26F |
Lees (Oldham) |
w/e |
22/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
27B |
Aintree |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
ALLOC |
26B |
Agecroft |
4w/e |
27/02/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
11/11/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1960 |
Fowler 7F 0-8-0 |
By late March, six Fowler ex-L.M.S.R. Class 7F 0-8-0 locomotives survived in stock, divided between Newton Heath 49508 an 49618(26A), and Agecroft 49505, 49627, 49637 an 49668 (26B). |
SLS/196006 |
18/03/1962 |
Agecroft MPD |
49618/68, 51206/7/37, 51407/8 were at Agecroft. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/06/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9668 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lees (Oldham) (26F) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49668 |
|
|
28/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
20/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
11/11/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49668 |
|
|
08/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|