Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 293 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18096 Week
» 71112 Month
» 190639 Year
» 3217492 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9659 |
on |
12/04/1932 |
British Railways |
49659 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 12/04/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 02/03/1957 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 10 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Fri 22/03/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
ALLOC |
27B |
Aintree |
w/e |
11/08/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/03/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/04/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9659 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49659 |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
02/03/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49659 |
|
|
22/03/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|