Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3925 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29959 Week
» 128604 Month
» 331268 Year
» 3358121 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9634 |
m/e |
12/1931 |
British Railways |
49634 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 24/06/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9634 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49634 |
|
|
22/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) |
|
|
19/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49634 from Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
24/06/1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|