Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3269 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29303 Week
» 127948 Month
» 330612 Year
» 3357465 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9625 |
on |
20/11/1931 |
British Railways |
49625 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Fri 20/11/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 05/01/1951 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Fri 12/01/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/11/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9625 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49625 |
|
|
17/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
14/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
05/01/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49625 |
|
|
12/01/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|