Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 821 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18624 Week
» 71640 Month
» 191167 Year
» 3218020 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9618 |
on |
18/04/1931 |
British Railways |
49618 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 18/04/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 07/10/1961 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26F |
Lees (Oldham) |
w/e |
28/04/1951 |
ALLOC |
26C |
Bolton |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
ALLOC |
26A |
Newton Heath |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
ALLOC |
26B |
Agecroft |
5w/e |
05/08/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1960 |
Fowler 7F 0-8-0 |
By late March, six Fowler ex-L.M.S.R. Class 7F 0-8-0 locomotives survived in stock, divided between Newton Heath 49508 an 49618(26A), and Agecroft 49505, 49627, 49637 an 49668 (26B). |
SLS/196006 |
18/03/1962 |
Agecroft MPD |
49618/68, 51206/7/37, 51407/8 were at Agecroft. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/04/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9618 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49618 |
|
|
28/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F) |
|
|
28/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49618 |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|