Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1008 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14414 Week
» 67430 Month
» 186957 Year
» 3213810 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9554 |
on |
10/09/1929 |
British Railways |
49554 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 10/09/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 27/08/1955 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 08/10/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/09/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9554 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49554 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
28/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
27/08/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49554 |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|