Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3810 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29844 Week
» 128489 Month
» 331153 Year
» 3358006 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9511 |
on |
10/05/1929 |
British Railways |
49511 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 10/05/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 16/05/1959 |
Service Life |
30 yrs , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
16/07/1949 |
Oil burning equipment removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/05/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9511 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
24/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49511 |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Oil burning equipment removed |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
14/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
16/05/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49511 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|