Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3017 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16423 Week
» 69439 Month
» 188966 Year
» 3215819 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9509 |
on |
02/05/1929 |
British Railways |
49509 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 02/05/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 16/05/1959 |
Service Life |
30 yrs , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Wed 02/09/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
02/05/1929 |
26F |
|
Lees (Oldham) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
26B |
|
Agecroft |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/05/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26B |
Agecroft |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/05/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/05/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9509 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lees (Oldham) (26F) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49509 |
|
|
28/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
16/05/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49509 |
|
|
02/09/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|