Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 4276 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 30310 Week
» 128955 Month
» 331619 Year
» 3358472 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9504 |
on |
18/04/1929 |
British Railways |
49504 |
on |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Thu 18/04/1929 |
Withdrawal |
During 04/1949 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
18/04/1929 |
25A |
|
Wakefield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
25D |
|
Mirfield |
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
04/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
25A |
Wakefield |
w/e |
13/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
25D |
Mirfield |
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/04/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9504 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49504 but not taken up |
|
|
1949 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
04/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9504 |
|
|