Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 584 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31234 Week
» 129879 Month
» 332543 Year
» 3359396 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
172 |
m/e |
10/1918 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9323 |
m/e |
04/1928 |
British Railways |
49323 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 10/1918 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/09/1962 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 11 mths , 23 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1918 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 172 |
|
|
04/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9323 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Watford (1C) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49323 |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
08/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
08/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49323 |
|
|