Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2880 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33530 Week
» 132175 Month
» 334839 Year
» 3361692 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
894 |
m/e |
07/1918 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9314 |
m/e |
09/1926 |
British Railways |
49314 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 07/1918 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/12/1962 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/05/1962 |
Nuneaton MPD |
Nuneaton's last LNW 0-8-0 49314 (transferred to Springs Branch) was under repair at Rugby on 19th May. |
SLS/196207 |
10/03/1963 |
Preston MPD (Stored) |
Stored at Preston on 10th March-42476/661, 45543/50, 49104/314/81/402/8/38/47/51. |
SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 |
Midland Miscellany (Stored) |
The new Water Orton station junction box-renamed Water Orton East Junction-was brought into use 12th May, 1963. Ketley Junc. was removed 12th May, 1963; it is now only possible to approach Ketley station via Lightmoor Junction. On 12th May, the collapse of Black Bridge (over the course of the old River Nene) at Stanground, Peterborough, closed the Peterborough East-March section and buses are now operating between Peterborough and Whittlesey. It is understood that the Ashbourne-Buxton line will not be available for passenger trains after Sunday, 26th May, when excursions ran from Hinckley to Tissington and Buxton, Alsager to Tissington and Buxton, Colne to Buxton and Ashbourne and Manchester (P) to Buxton and Ashbourne. The Atherton Junc. (Bag Lane)-Pennington South Junc. section of the former LNWR Kenyon Junc.-Bolton Gt. Moor St. branch is to be officially closed w.e.f. 17th June, 1963. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1918 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 894 |
|
|
09/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9314 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49314 |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49314 |
|
|