Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 1 Online
» 298 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18101 Week
» 71117 Month
» 190644 Year
» 3217497 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2441 |
m/e |
05/1918 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9302 |
m/e |
04/1928 |
British Railways |
49302 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 05/1918 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1951 |
Service Life |
33 yrs , 7 mths |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1918 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2441 |
|
|
04/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9302 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49302 but not taken up |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
12/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9302 |
|
|