Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1083 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31733 Week
» 130378 Month
» 333042 Year
» 3359895 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2167 |
m/e |
02/1918 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9287 |
m/e |
08/1927 |
British Railways |
49287 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 02/1918 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/12/1962 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 10 mths , 0 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
4D |
Abergavenny |
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
ALLOC |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1918 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2167 |
|
|
08/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9287 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
19/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49287 |
|
|
20/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49287 |
|
|