Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 290 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18093 Week
» 71109 Month
» 190636 Year
» 3217489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
62 |
m/e |
07/1914 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9247 |
m/e |
03/1927 |
British Railways |
49247 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 07/1914 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/11/1957 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
20/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
3B |
Bushbury |
w/e |
12/05/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/11/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1914 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 62 |
|
|
03/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9247 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49247 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
16/11/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49247 |
|
|