Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2857 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33507 Week
» 132152 Month
» 334816 Year
» 3361669 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2336 |
m/e |
05/1914 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9241 |
m/e |
09/1927 |
British Railways |
49241 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 05/1914 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 20/09/1952 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 4 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1952 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1914 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2336 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
09/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9241 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49241 |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
08/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
1952 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49241 |
|
|