Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2031 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19834 Week
» 72850 Month
» 192377 Year
» 3219230 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1142 |
m/e |
05/1914 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9239 |
m/e |
05/1928 |
British Railways |
49239 |
m/e |
06/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 05/1914 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1957 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1914 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1142 |
|
|
05/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9239 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
14/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
28/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
05/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
06/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49239 |
|
|
09/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49239 |
|
|