Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2297 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32947 Week
» 131592 Month
» 334256 Year
» 3361109 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2452 |
m/e |
10/1913 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9224 |
m/e |
11/1927 |
British Railways |
49224 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 10/1913 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/12/1962 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1913 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2452 |
|
|
11/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9224 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plodder Lane (10D) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49224 |
|
|
05/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49224 |
|
|