Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 547 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31197 Week
» 129842 Month
» 332506 Year
» 3359359 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2001 |
m/e |
03/1912 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9162 |
m/e |
08/1927 |
British Railways |
49162 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 03/1912 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/05/1953 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2D |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
3B |
Bushbury |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
ALLOC |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/05/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1912 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2001 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
08/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9162 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49162 |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49162 |
|
|