Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4201 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17607 Week
» 70623 Month
» 190150 Year
» 3217003 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
411 |
m/e |
01/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9411 |
m/e |
08/1927 |
British Railways |
49411 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 01/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/10/1961 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
01/01/1949 |
ALLOC |
2D |
Coventry |
4w/e |
12/06/1954 |
ALLOC |
3B |
Bushbury |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
ALLOC |
3A |
Bescot |
5w/e |
31/10/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1961 |
Bescot MPD (21B) (Stored) |
Stored are 42421, 42940, 43963, 47296/363, 49021/77/99/126/275/343/411, 58119/204/283. Also possibly stored 40694 an 58122/3. |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 411 |
|
|
08/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9411 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49411 |
|
|
01/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coventry (2D) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
24/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
14/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49411 |
|
|