Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 917 Today
» 4601 Yesterday
» 917 Week
» 54371 Month
» 400795 Year
» 3427648 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
373 |
m/e |
01/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9407 |
m/e |
10/1927 |
British Railways |
49407 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 01/1922 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1964 |
Service Life |
42 yrs , 10 mths |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/12/1963 |
Bescot MPD |
49361 an 49407 went light to Crewe South on 18th December, where they are to be fitted with snow-ploughs and kept available in steam for snow-plough duties if required. As 49173 is awaiting spares, this leaves only two Super Ds for four rostered jobs and thus Class 4Fs have been used (ex-store), although 48895 is often borrowed from Bushbury. |
SLS/196401 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 373 |
|
|
10/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9407 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49407 |
|
|
25/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
18/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
10/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (21C) |
|
|
20/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
21/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49407 |
|
|